Councils and Committees
Reporting to President Riley - meets quarterly.
Research Advisory Council Organization
- David Christini (Chair; Senior Vice President for Research)
- Marcus Lambert (co-Vice Chair; representing HRAC)
- William Chirico (co-Vice Chair; representing LRAC)
- Aimee Afable (SPH; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Sherene Sharath (Surgery; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Salvador Dura-Bernal (Physiology and Pharmacology; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Itsaso Garcia-Arcos (Medicine; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Robert Foronjy (Medicine; 07/01/2023 – 06/30/2026)
- Ashley Grosso (Medicine; 07/01/2024-06/30/2027)
- Thomas Wallach (Medicine; 07/01/2024-06/30/2027)
- Past Members
James Knowles (Cell Biology; 10/1/2020 – 2/14/2022)
Carla Boutin-Foster (Medicine; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2022)
Tim Bigdeli (Psychiatry; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2022)
Juan Marcos Alarcon (Pathology; 10/1/2020 – 6/30/2022)
Jacquelyn Meyers (Psychiatry; 10/1/20 – 06/30/2023)
Todd Sacktor (Physiology & Pharmacology; 10/1/2020 – 6/30/2023)
Deborah Gustafson (Neurology; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2023)
Tracey Wilson (SPH; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2023)
Jack DeHovitz (Medicine; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2024)
Thomas Mackie (School of Public Health; 07/01/2023 – 06/30/2024)
Reporting to Senior Vice President for Research - meets monthly.
- Marcus Lambert (Chair; Associate VP for Human Research)
- Camille Clare (Medicine; 07/01/2023 – 06/30/2026)
- Sherene Sharath (Surgery; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Marie-Claire Rosenberg Roberts (College of Nursing; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Aimee Afable (School of Public health; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Ashley Grosso (Medicine; 07/01/2024-06/30/2027)
- Thomas Wallach (Medicine; 07/01/2024-06/30/2027)
- Carla Boutin-Foster (Medicine; 07/01/2024-06/01/2026)
- Jason Vladescu (School of Health Professions; 07/01/2024 – 06/30/2027)
- Past Members
Carla Boutin-Foster (Medicine): 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2022
Tim Bigdeli (Psychiatry): 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2022
Barbara Kitchener (College of Nursing): 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2022
Tracey Wilson (School of Public Health; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2023)
Jenny Libien (Pathology; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2023)
Richard Coico (Cell Biology): 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2022
Deborah Gustafson (Neurology; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2024)
David Kaufman (School of Health Professions; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2024)
Jack DeHovitz (Medicine; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2024)
Jason Lazar (Medicine; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2024)
Thomas Mackie (School of Public Health; 07/01/2023 – 06/30/2024)
Reporting to Senior Vice President for Research - meets monthly.
- William Chirico (Chair; Associate VP for Laboratory Research)
- Sabina Hrabetova; (Cell Biology; 07/01/2024-06/30/2026)(Chair from 10/1/2023 – 06/30/2024)
- Robert Foronjy (Medicine; 07/01/2023 – 06/30/2026)
- Laura Martello-Rooney (Medicine; 07/01/2023 – 06/30/2026)
- Itsaso Garcia-Arcos (Medicine; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Xian-Cheng Jiang (Cell Biology; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Salvador Dura-Bernal (Physiology and Pharmacology; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2025)
- Rena Orman (Cell Biology; 07/01/2024-06/30/2027)
- Alexander Ramirez (Physiology and Pharmacology; 07/01/2024-06/30/2027)
- Past Members
James Knowles (Cell Biology; 10/1/2020 – 02/14/2022)
Ellen Hsu (Physiology and Pharmacology; 10/1/2020–06/30/2022)
Henri Tiedge (Physiology and Pharmacology; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2022)
Juan Marcos Alarcon (Pathology; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2022)
Sergios-Orestis Kolokotronis (School of Public Health; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2023)
Jacquelyn Meyers (Psychiatry; 10/01/2020 – 06/30/2023)
Todd Sacktor (Physiology and Pharmacology; 10/1/2020 – 06/30/2024)
Peter Bergold (Physiology and Pharmacology; 07/01/2022 – 06/30/2024)
- Savador Dura-Bernal (Chair; Physiology & Pharmacology)
- Jacquelyn Meyers (Psychiatry)
- Sergios-Orestis Kolokotronis (Epidemiology and Biostatistics)
- Tim Bigdeli (Psychiatry)
- Scott Bunnell (ad hoc participant; HPC Specialist)
- David Chorlian (ad hoc participant; Henri Begleiter Neurodynamics Laboratory)
- Ayesha Joshi (ad hoc participant; Director of Research Program Development)
- Marcus Lambert (ad hoc participant; Assoc. VP of Research Strategy and Operations)
Past Members
- James Knowles (Cell Biology)
- Steven Levine (Chair; Neurology)
- David Berger (CEO, University Hospital at Downstate)
- Ellen Ginzler (Medicine)
- Jeanette Jakus (Medicine)
- Rauno Joks (Medicine)
- Panagiotis Kougias (Surgery)
- Subodh Saggi (Medicine)
- Jack DeHovitz (Medicine)
- Marcus Lambert (ad hoc participant; Assoc. VP of Research Strategy and Operations)
- Sharon Sealy (ad hoc participant; Deputy Operations Manager, RF)
- Yihenew Abetu (ad hoc participant; Director, Clinical Trials)
- Kevin Nellis (ad hoc participant; Executive Director, IRB)